Ainsworth, Craig Douglas (CPSO#: 82435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing, Room 517
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73958
Fax: (905) 577-8034
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig Ainsworth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ainsworth ( CPSO# 82435 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
M517 - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Center
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG DOUGLAS AINSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009