Ainsworth, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 43591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Molecular Diagnostic Lab
Rm B10-128 Victoria Hosp Campus
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8122
Fax: (519) 685-8085
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cancer Genetics
L H S C - Victoria Hospital
Room B5-138
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8727
Fax: (519) 685-8005
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 14 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH AINSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989