Aitken, Alexander Stewart (CPSO#: 65321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital Of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 430-8120 Ext. 3315
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia, Ontario
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Stewart Aitken Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aitken ( CPSO# 65321 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER STEWART AITKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AITKEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993