Aitken, Susan Elaine (CPSO#: 23459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 480 Brigitta Street Ottawa, ON K2S 0H8
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015