Aivas, Inge (CPSO#: 86404)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 20 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2011 to 20 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2012 to 20 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2014