Aizenman, Allan Israel (CPSO#: 23682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Al 3102C
11 Holland Cross Tower B
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 957-8400
Fax: (613) 841-1668
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN ISRAEL AIZENMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AIZENMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983