Ajani, Adenike Frances (CPSO#: 103960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E5
Phone: 289-237-6538
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adenike Ajani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ajani ( CPSO# 103960)
Dr. O. Ajani ( CPSO# 102293)

Business Address:
Room C109
135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E5
Phone Number: (289) 237-6538

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADENIKE FRANCES AJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2014 to 07 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016