Ajayi-Obe, Jacob Oluwagbenga (CPSO#: 85774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Road Diagnostic Clinic
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 336-6019
Fax: (519) 336-7136
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.O. Ajayi-Obe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ajayi-Obe ( CPSO# 85774 )

Business Address:
London Road Diagnostic Clinic
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 336-6016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB OLUWAGBENGA AJAYI-OBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJAYI-OBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2007