Akbari-Nasab, Ardalan (CPSO#: 94304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ardalan Akbari-Nasab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akbari-Nasab ( CPSO# 94304 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Ardalan Akbari-Nasab may practice medicine independently as a hospitalist,
            only.