Akhavan, Dariush (CPSO#: 57124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Dariush  Akhavan  may  practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.