Akhlaghi-Kakroudi, Fatereh (CPSO#: 83267)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Center on Yonge
Unit 118
7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone: (905) 597-6543
Fax: (905) 597-8765
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatereh Akhlaghi-Kakroudi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Akhlaghi-Kakroudi ( CPSO# 83267 )

Business Address:
118 - 7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C6
Phone Number: (905) 597-6543

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEREH AKHLAGHI-KAKROUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHLAGHI-KAKROUDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007