Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Akhtar, Jawed (CPSO#: 61760)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Urdu

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 2011