Akhtar, Sabrina Nadine (CPSO#: 86508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akhtar and Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 86508 )
Dr. A. Alam ( CPSO# 86825 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street - West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-2864

Business Address:
Unit 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Business Address:
Unit 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABRINA NADINE AKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009