Akhtari, Shahrzad (CPSO#: 87559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shaheed Sadooghi University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A 202
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone: (905) 884-6500
Fax: (905) 884-6100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahrzad Akhtari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtari ( CPSO# 87559 )

Business Address:
Unit A 202
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone Number: (905) 884-6500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHRZAD AKHTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009