Akhter, Mohammed Salim (CPSO#: 30189)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013