Akinfemiwa, Omotayo Bolatito (CPSO#: 83195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201,
2100 Finch Av West
Toronto, On, M3N 2Z9
Toronto ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: 4167407233
Fax: 4167447233
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMOTAYO BOLATITO AKINFEMIWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINFEMIWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007