Akinsooto, Victor Shola (CPSO#: 88164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ilorin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone: (519) 650-0011
Fax: (519) 650-0033
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.S. Akinsooto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 560-0011


Corporation Name: Akinsooto, Amin, Faghih and Karnis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 73115 )
Dr. M. Karnis ( CPSO# 66995 )
Dr. M. Faghih ( CPSO# 78171 )
Dr. V. Akinsooto ( CPSO# 88164 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
4271 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2P 2X7
Phone Number: (519) 650-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR SHOLA AKINSOOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINSOOTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2008