Akintan, Olabode Olanrewaju (CPSO#: 89916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Child and Youth Mental Health 3G86
McMaster Children's Hospital
P.O. Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76035
Fax: (905) 521-7978
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olabode Akintan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akintan ( CPSO# 89916 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept Psych & Behavioural Neurosci
1200 Main Street West Room 3G-88
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. Nnamdi Ugwunze Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akintan ( CPSO# 89916 )
Dr. N. Ugwunze ( CPSO# 110668)

Business Address:
Southwest Centre For Forensic
410 Sunset Drive
St Thomas ON  N5R 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 631-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLABODE OLANREWAJU AKINTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINTAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009