Akinyele, Adegboyega Adedapo (CPSO#: 69780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Ste Marie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3J9
Phone: (705) 444-5695
Fax: (705) 444-6043
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Meaford General Hospital
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 538-1311
Fax: (519) 538-1357
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinyele ( CPSO# 69780 )

Business Address:
31 Saint Marie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 3J9
Phone Number: (705) 444-5695


Corporation Name: Lisi and Akinyele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lisi ( CPSO# 79294 )
Dr. A. Akinyele ( CPSO# 69780 )

Business Address:
The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Suite 300
28 Huron Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C4
Phone Number: (705) 444-0089

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEGBOYEGA ADEDAPO AKINYELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINYELE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1996