Akkor, Sueda (CPSO#: 52489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: Oztunc, Sueda (used until: 04 Nov 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUEDA AKKOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKKOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012