Akotoye, Christian Komla (CPSO#: 63615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2630 Kipling Avenue
Suite 4
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B9
Phone: (416) 744-2756
Fax: (416) 744-8495
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ghana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN KOMLA AKOTOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKOTOYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992