Akoury, Hani Albert George (CPSO#: 65297)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joeseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6373
Fax: (416) 530-6377
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Akoury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akoury ( CPSO# 65297 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6373

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANI ALBERT GEORGE AKOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKOURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1992