Aksoy, Davut Erol (CPSO#: 60923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
168 Garrison Road
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1M4
Phone: (905) 994-9494
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVUT EROL AKSOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKSOY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2003