Al Abbasi, Thamer Abduljabbar Mohamed Hadi (CPSO#: 88272)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 18 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2014