Al Adel, Fadwa Fida F (CPSO#: 100532)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 07 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2014