Al Ali, Raed Ali Saleh (CPSO#: 80660)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 May 2004 to 07 Jul 2004
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011