Al Anazi, Abdullah Foraih Mashad (CPSO#: 80023)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 10 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006