Al Beshir, Mohammad Sulaiman A (CPSO#: 90413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6830 Ammar Bin Thabit St.
Al Muraikabat District
Dammam 32253
Saudi Arabia
Phone: + 966 13 822-4 Ext. 6812
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SULAIMAN A AL BESHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL BESHIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 May 2009 to 14 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2009 to 03 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015