Al Bin Saleh, Abdullah (CPSO#: 80664)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2004 to 24 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005