Al Bustani, Nazar Jaffar Ali (CPSO#: 80549)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jan 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Mar 2004 to 18 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Mar 2005 to 30 Apr 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2005