Al Dhufairi, Fahad Abdullah A (CPSO#: 108607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dammam, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Western University
Room M103 Medical Sciences Building
1151 Richmond St North
London ON  N6A5C1
Phone: (519) 661-2019
Fax: (519)850-2492
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHAD ABDULLAH A AL DHUFAIRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL DHUFAIRI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. AL DHUFAIRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL DHUFAIRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL DHUFAIRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL DHUFAIRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL DHUFAIRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2016 to 22 Apr 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 23 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019