Al Dughaishi, Tamima Rashid Humoud (CPSO#: 85690)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 24 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Nov 2006 to 11 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2008