Al Duwaiki, Suad Marhoon Said (CPSO#: 102549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2018

Expiry Date:  28 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 26660
Fax: (905)527-2707
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUAD MARHOON SAID AL DUWAIKI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL DUWAIKI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL DUWAIKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL DUWAIKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL DUWAIKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. AL DUWAIKI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. AL DUWAIKI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 28 Feb 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2014 to 03 Feb 2014
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2014 to 14 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2018 to 22 May 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Feb 2019
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2019