Al Fanna Al Araimi, Tariq Abdullah Said (CPSO#: 102656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 26 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rheumatology Department of Medicine
190 Elizabeth Street
R. Fraser Elliott Bldg, Suite 3-805
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-978-0745
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARIQ ABDULLAH SAID AL FANNA AL ARAIMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL FANNA AL ARAIMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2014 to 25 May 2014
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018