Al Fifi, Mohammad Hussein Mohammad (CPSO#: 70757)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2002