Al Ghanim, Nayef Saleh A (CPSO#: 94256)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nayef Al Ghanim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2014