Al Giraigri, Ali Hasan Humaid (CPSO#: 84156)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 26 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 26 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013