Al Habib, Khalid Fayez I (CPSO#: 75355)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003