Al Halaseh, Lana Jaleel Sama'n (CPSO#: 94437)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2010 to 22 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012