Al Harbi, Qasim Kholaif Saqor (CPSO#: 88113)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 20 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Feb 2011