Al Harithy, Ru'aa Said Khider Al Orabi (CPSO#: 82224)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 28 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 26 Apr 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2006 to 28 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2008 to 28 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 May 2013