Al Hashemi, Abdulaziz Ahmad Mohammad Mustafawi (CPSO#: 74105)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006