Al Hashmi, Shaikhan Nasser Mohammed (CPSO#: 90028)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 11 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 03 Jul 2009
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2009 to 03 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 03 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2011 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015