Al Hatlani, Maher Mohammed S (CPSO#: 86081)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 07 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 08 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Apr 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010