Al Hejaili, Faris Falah Raji (CPSO#: 88225)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2008 to 20 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014