Al Houqani, Mohammed Sulaiman Ahmed Saeed (CPSO#: 80538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O.Box 17666
Internal Medicine Department
College of Medicine
Al-Ain 17666
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97137137666
Fax: +97137672995
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sleep Disorders Specialized Clinic
Al-Ain
Al-Ain 16353
United Arab Emirates
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97137663616
Fax: +97137663617
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED SULAIMAN AHMED SAEED AL HOUQANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HOUQANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2004 to 16 May 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008