Al Jabri, Abdullah Sultan Ahmed (CPSO#: 108771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 21 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of General Surgery
30 Bond Street DW 3 071
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5422
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH SULTAN AHMED AL JABRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL JABRI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL JABRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL JABRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL JABRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL JABRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL JABRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Apr 2016 to 08 May 2016
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2016 to 20 Dec 2016
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018