Al Jalal, Essam Mohammad Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 75889)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013