Al Jarallah, Fouziyah Mohammed Nasser (CPSO#: 77054)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 10 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 Oct 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2005