Al Jughiman, Mohammed Khaled A (CPSO#: 95024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Electoral District: 03

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED KHALED A AL JUGHIMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL JUGHIMAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL JUGHIMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL JUGHIMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL JUGHIMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL JUGHIMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL JUGHIMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017